HEART SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly exercise and relaxation sessions for persons in Stockton, Billingham and Hartlepool with heart and circulatory conditions. Sessions led by BACPR level 4 qualified tutors. Sharing experiences in group discussions and social events provide practical support. Referrals from hospitals and GPs etc. and by self-referral with authorisation of fitness for exercise. Family and friends welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 14 January 2019: CIO registration
- HEART SUPPORT (NORTH TEES AND HARTLEPOOL) (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denis Robinson | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR GILES ALEXANDER JEFFERSON YOUNG | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Dicken | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Hare | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Walker | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Maureen Sargent | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Atkinson | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Anne Bunce | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.32k | £12.25k | £17.01k | £17.33k | £19.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.40k | £8.31k | £13.91k | £15.88k | £15.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR PERSONS WITH HEART AND CIRCULATORY CONDITIONS AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THEIR HEALTH. THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR THE ORGANISATION IS PREDOMINATELY THE NORTH TEES AND HARTLEPOOL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Upsall Grove
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS19 7BJ
- Phone:
- 01642653638
- Email:
- HEATHER.BUNCE007@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
heartsupportnth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window