WILD WINGS BIRDS OF PREY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wild Wings Birds of Prey is to relieve the suffering of Birds of Prey in need of care and attention and to provide and maintain homes / facilities for the reception, care, and treatment of such birds. To promote humane behaviour towards birds of prey by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for birds of prey to educate the public in welfare and prevention of cruelty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.39k | £34.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.26k | £39.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF BIRDS OF PREY IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH BIRDS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS BIRDS OF PREY BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR BIRDS OF PREY WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO BIRD OF PREY WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG BIRDS OF PREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window