Financial history ENCOUNTER ARENA

Charity number: 1182247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.57k £17.71k £44.44k £55.00k £62.80k
Total expenditure £20.09k £15.21k £34.00k £51.00k £56.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k £12.50k N/A £10.00k