Accounts and annual returns THE FOXTON INCLINED PLANE TRUST

Charity number: 513241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 February 2021 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 April 2021 165 days late Download Open in new window