Financial history THE FOXTON INCLINED PLANE TRUST

Charity number: 513241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £71.96k £19.76k £24.31k £30.65k £39.81k
Total expenditure £114.86k £27.46k £28.55k £44.30k £46.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.57k £6.00k N/A N/A