THE FOXTON INCLINED PLANE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foxton inclined plane trust is the voluntary organisation dedicated to the restoration of the foxton inclined plane boat lift and the preservation of its history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 16 November 1982: Standard registration
- FOXTON CANAL MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Hitchcock | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Beech | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Giles Parsons | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Park | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Rupert Harris | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY MATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.96k | £19.76k | £24.31k | £30.65k | £39.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.86k | £27.46k | £28.55k | £44.30k | £46.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.57k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2021 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH JULY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND FOSTER PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE FOXTON INCLINED PLANE INCLUDING ANY ASSOCIATED FEATURES OR LAND IN THE SURROUNDING AREA TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION OF THE PLANE TO GOOD AND NAVIGABLE STRUCTURAL AND MECHANICAL ORDER AND CONDITION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foxton Canal Museum
Middle Lock
Gumley Road
Foxton
Market Harborough
LE16 7RA
- Phone:
- 01162792657
- Email:
- info@fipt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window