Trustees THE FOXTON INCLINED PLANE TRUST

Charity number: 513241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Robert Hitchcock Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Michael George Beech Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Anthony Giles Parsons Trustee 16 August 2018
None on record
Sean Park Trustee 05 July 2018
None on record
Derek Rupert Harris Trustee 15 August 2013
None on record
MARY MATTS Trustee
None on record