SAPPHIRE SUPREMES

Charity number: 1180999
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sapphire Supremes Majorettes is a dance troupe based in Stanley, Wakefield. We train all age ranges to perform baton twirling, pom pom and military dance routines with a view to competing locally. We also perform at galas and other community events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £30,487
Total expenditure: £26,523

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAPPHIRE SUPREMES MAJORETTES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATIE JACKSON Chair 19 June 2018
None on record
LYNNE POWELL Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
ELAINE DAWSON Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.68k £3.74k £14.87k £22.15k £30.49k
Total expenditure £2.42k £2.65k £12.91k £31.22k £26.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 June 2024 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
65 ASH CRESCENT
STANLEY
WAKEFIELD
WF3 4NY
Phone:
07932586041
Website:

No information available