THE BRITISH INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve, for the benefit of the public, persons suffering from inherited metabolic disease by advancing the education of professionals involved in their diagnosis, care and treatment; and To promote, for the benefit of the public, research into the treatment of inherited metabolic disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 June 2019: CIO registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 1006789 THE BRITISH INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE GROUP
- BIMDG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Edward Davison | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eamon McCarron | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saikat Santra | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Lam | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathan Cantley | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Germaine Pierre | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Caller | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bernd Schwahn | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Redwood | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Victoria Robertson | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jayne Mcsweeney | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nishan Guha | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Morris | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Freestone | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shona Lindsay Crawford Brothwell | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hoi Yee Wu | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sergei Korenev | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Helen Dawson | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faiza Adrees | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Catherine O'Reilly | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Donna Maria Fullerton | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marianne Barr | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Richard Barski FRCPath | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Helen Skeath MSc | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.35k | £21.45k | £12.43k | £13.75k | £12.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.18k | £18.33k | £6.08k | £20.68k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1 TO RELIEVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PERSONS SUFFERING FROM INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED IN THEIR DIAGNOSIS, CARE AND TREATMENT; AND 3.2 TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, RESEARCH INTO THE TREATMENT OF INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEWITSONS
SHAKESPEARE HOUSE
42 NEWMARKET ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8EP
- Phone:
- 02074059200
- Email:
- james.davison@gosh.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window