THE REV. TED BAINES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Making grants and awards to charities registered with the Charity Commission 2) Providing (within available resources), financial matched funding in support of younger generations (here defined as individuals born after 1 January 1990), to encourage, promote and support them in furthering charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM BAINES | Chair | 30 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Laura Bos | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hennessy | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Baines | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.65k | £21.63k | £8.68k | £9.53k | £17.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £18.42k | £19.28k | £5.41k | £9.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH THE LATE REV TED BAINES AND HIS IMMEDIATE FAMILY SUPPORTED IN HIS LIFETIME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: · MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES BUT EXCLUDING ANY SUCH GRANTS WHICH THE TRUSTEES BELIEVE WOULD BE INCOMPATIBLE WITH CHRISTIAN BELIEF AND ETHOS · PROVIDING (WITHIN AVAILABLE RESOURCES), FINANCIAL MATCHED FUNDING IN SUPPORT OF YOUNGER GENERATIONS (HERE DEFINED AS INDIVIDUALS BORN AFTER 1 JANUARY 1990), TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THEM IN FURTHERING CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Contact information
- Address:
-
RED ROOFS
STATION ROAD
FLAX BOURTON
BRISTOL
BS48 1UA
- Phone:
- 07771547229
- Email:
- tim@bcsconsultants.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window