CAMBRIDGE JEWISH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Jewish Faith for the benefit of those inhabitants of the area, in particular but not exclusively through holding religious services; providing education in the Jewish culture and religion and through the provision of burial in accordance with Jewish rites for the benefit of those inhabitants of the area of benefit being persons of the Jewish Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 January 2020: CIO registration
- 23 May 2022: Funds received from 289724 CAMBRIDGE JEWISH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
- CAMBRIDGE JEWISH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION CHEVRA KADISHA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY MARILYN FERSHT | Chair | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bernice Katz | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathrin Peters | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eva Simmons | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Morris Treasurer | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Rachel Elizabeth Meller | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Tirza Bleehen | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Helena Barnett | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Marks | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Collis | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.25k | £7.77k | £12.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.21k | £7.08k | £7.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Jan 2020 as amended on 29 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH HOLDING RELIGIOUS SERVICES; PROVIDING EDUCATION IN THE JEWISH CULTURE AND RELIGION AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BURIAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH JEWISH RITES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BEING PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH. (2) THE RELIEF FROM NEED, POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF JEWISH PERSONS AND OTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING MAKING GRANTS TO JEWISH CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Haverhill Road
Stapleford
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5BX
- Phone:
- 01223 845201
- Email:
- info@kmmt.org.uk
- Website:
-
cambridgejewishresidents.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window