Eco Brixs UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/training Disability The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty Environment/conservation/heritage Economic/community Development/employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 June 2019: CIO registration
- ECO BRIX'S (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Worster | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Kedge Martin | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Topham | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick Chapman | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anjana Krishnan | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.07k | £22.42k | £126.13k | £183.03k | £290.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.77k | £26.48k | £123.70k | £181.27k | £275.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2019 as amended on 06 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE MASAKA REGION OF UGANDA, BY SUPPORT TO: (A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE, RECLAMATION, RECYCLING AND IMPROVED WASTE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES; (B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION, WASTE REDUCTION AND WASTE DISPOSAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Vicarage Close
Aston
Bampton
Oxfordshire
OX18 2BZ
- Phone:
- 07860351921
- Email:
- andyteale@ecobrixs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window