ACRONYM COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT (ACE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACE is committed to empowering women (and men) and their communities to participate fully in economic and civic life across all sectors as essential to building stronger communities. We work with disadvantaged wo/men, and young adults to help them to improve the quality of life and become more sustainable through our delivery of creative and innovative inclusion and diversity education programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £84,535 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 February 2020: Standard registration
- ACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marlena Magda YOUSAF | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nuha ABDALLA | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esra MOHAMMEDALI | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Azarias Luke MORRIS | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Moses Uwaomah NDUKWE | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.17k | £80.21k | £80.98k | £105.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.32k | £78.55k | £67.59k | £112.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.17k | N/A | £80.98k | £84.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ENGLISH, MATHS, SCIENCE, CV WRITING AND READING AND WRITING SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Marlborough Road
Tuebrook
LIVERPOOL
L13 8AX
- Phone:
- 07737079336
- Email:
- acronymenterprises@gmail.com
- Website:
-
empowermentace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window