CHARITY EVALUATION WORKING GROUP (CHEW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a network for those interested in measuring the impact of the third sector. Some of us are trained researchers. Some of us are learning on the job. We share our knowledge, ideas and experience with each other.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jami Louise Dixon | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abhishek Velani | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Bradshaw-Walsh | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Kristy Evers | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hood | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Salisbury | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vinal Khushal Karania | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Scanlon | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.02k | £5.44k | £11.32k | £63.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.46k | £24.21k | £20.43k | £18.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTS OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND OTHER FACILITIES, SERVICES OR SUPPORT AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Carr Manor Drive
LEEDS
Leeds
West Yorkshire
LS17 5AU
- Phone:
- 07850107543
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window