Accounts and annual returns NORTHUMBRIA SQUASH RACKETS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1180804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 01 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 21 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window