Trustees CHILTERN FOODBANK

Charity number: 1181094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Stewart Salkeld Chair 21 May 2024
None on record
Varkey M Abraham B.Com ACIM Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
John Shaw Trustee 14 January 2021
PRODUCERS DIRECT
Received: On time
Christopher Paul Kay Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
Colin Osbaldeston FCA Trustee 03 July 2020
None on record
Emma Burgham Trustee 16 June 2020
None on record