NUTTER FIELD CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nutter Field CIO owns a piece of land in Nutter Lane Wanstead which it rents out to provide outdoor space and buildings to 3 local sports clubs Drummond Tennis Club, Wanstead Central Bowls Club and Wanstead and Snaresbrook Cricket club. The aim of the charity is to help facilitate sporting opportunities for children in the local community who may have limited access to other sports facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redbridge
Governance
- 23 July 2019: CIO registration
- 09 February 2020: Funds received from 271454 GERTRUDE EMILY NUTTER (NUTTER FIELD SPORTS GROUND)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Hepworth-Jones | Chair | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Olive Eleanor Thursby | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Shaw | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £4.68k | £1.93k | £4.98k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £181 | £206 | £10.25k | £541 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO HOLD AND MANAGE THE SPORTS GROUND KNOWN AS NUTTER FIELD SPORTS GROUND, WANSTEAD, FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK PROPER FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE CHURCHES, CHAPELS, DAY SCHOOLS, SUNDAY SCHOOLS, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTES OR ASSOCIATIONS OF THE SAID PARISH OF WANSTEAD AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND OF THE POOR, THE INHABITANTS OR ANY SUCH OTHER PERSONS OF THE SAID PARISH AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Rectory
37 Wanstead Place
Wanstead
London
E11 2SW
- Phone:
- 07711811688
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window