CROYDON PERFORMING ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of the public in the arts of music, dance, and speech in all its branches. Performance opportunities, constructive comments provided by high-quality BIFF adjudicators; a competitive element to some classes. The annual festival classes are open to the public. Concerts and other workshops also open to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 19 December 2018: CIO registration
- 14 December 2019: Funds received from 1039606 CROYDON PERFORMING ARTS FESTIVAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JON DEERING | Chair | 03 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura McHale | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Rodgers | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arunangshu Chatterjee | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vamshikrishna Vishnudas | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Flynn John Brayn Le Brocq | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hutchinson | Trustee | 03 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.52k | £11.70k | £11.10k | £6.16k | £6.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.17k | £11.18k | £20.32k | £13.70k | £16.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Dec 2018 as amended on 13 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE AND SPEECH IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Dalmally Road
CROYDON
CR0 6LW
- Phone:
- 07944694892
- Email:
- cpafchair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window