GURU HARGOBIND SPORTS CLUB ERITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for wrestling, Greco, Roman Wrestling and Kabaddi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kulvinder Singh | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARDEEP KAUR JOHAL | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kiranpreet Dhadda | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tarsem Singh | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DALBIR SINGH SANDHU | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £5.11k | £7.47k | £5.81k | £7.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £1.82k | £8.98k | £5.72k | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2024 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2024 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WRESTLING, GRECO ROMAN WRESTLING AND KABADDI
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 WOOLWICH ROAD
LONDON
SE2 0DY
- Phone:
- 07894994055
- Email:
- kul_2@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window