LIFE ABUNDANT PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1181849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the CIO are for the benefit of the public, (a) to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement (b) to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services (c) to advance education in the United Kingdom or the World as the Church Council from time to time may think fit

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £166,465
Total expenditure: £67,908

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • LAPC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev WESSLY LUKOSE DR Chair 14 April 2018
BIRMINGHAM PENTECOSTAL FELLOWSHIP
Recently registered
BIRMINGHAM PENTECOSTAL FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
KINDLE COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
Jacob Roy Trustee 22 April 2023
None on record
Biju Raj Matthew Trustee 14 April 2018
None on record
JOY THOMAS Trustee 14 April 2018
None on record
Dr Shebu Lukose Trustee 14 April 2018
FAITH TABERNACLE CHURCH KETTERING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.70k £58.85k £57.93k £125.04k £166.47k
Total expenditure £47.17k £27.83k £28.42k £40.52k £67.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 GROVE ROAD
WHETSTONE
LEICESTER
LE8 6LN
Phone:
07387348145