PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 513275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To own, administer and maintain the Theatre premises for the benefit of the Pendle Hippodrome Theatre Company, Pendle Hippodrome Youth Theatre and various other groups and organisations who hire the Theatre for the benefit of the wider local community. To encourage, support and promote community involvement, local productions, festivals etc. The Theatre is run solely on a voluntary basis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £168,492
Total expenditure: £143,934

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN MASON Chair
None on record
Matthew Hargreaves Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Patricia Lisa Manley Trustee 17 August 2021
None on record
Neil James GOODALL Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Helen Louise Nelson Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
Martin Derick Cleaver Trustee 24 February 2015
None on record
Stevan Manley Trustee 25 February 2014
THE COLNE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
David Farrer Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
MR JOE WHITTAM Trustee
THE COLNE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
KARIN MICHELLE WILSON Trustee
None on record
PAUL SMITH THOMPSON Trustee
THE COLNE OPERATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
KEITH WALTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £140.12k £49.51k £123.93k £166.08k £168.49k
Total expenditure £123.59k £55.46k £57.49k £137.88k £143.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.96k £16.30k £25.95k £11.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HIPPODROME THEATRE
NEW MARKET STREET
COLNE
LANCASHIRE
BB8 9BJ
Phone:
01282863210