THE PETE ATKINS YOUTH HOCKEY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1181103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Enabling Schools to provide Hockey coaching as part of the curriculum and/or as an after School Activity. Also encourage participation in organised competitions with other schools. Provide small grants or equipment to help young players enter the world of Hockey or to achieve there ambitions to be the best they can be at the sport.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £244
Total expenditure: £6,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Colin Ball Chair 01 October 2018
None on record
Nadia Moore Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Baldev Laly Trustee 22 June 2020
None on record
Neil Petfield Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Mr Peter Anthony Russell Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
David Wesley Sims Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Mr Alfred William Wimshurst Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £50.00k £0 £367 £1.05k £244
Total expenditure £1.00k £250 £1.42k £3.14k £6.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 BROOK GARDENS
EMSWORTH
PO10 7JY
Phone:
07771797161
Website:

payhf.org.uk