Financial history THE PHOENIX SWIMMING CLUB FOR DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 513279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £422 £216 £1 £1 £184
Total expenditure £638 £585 £123 £0 £327
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A