Trustees DIDCOT VOLUNTEER DRIVERS

Charity number: 1183404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Scane Chair 05 July 2022
None on record
Christopher Holmes Trustee 16 October 2024
None on record
Ian Snowdon Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Helen Cooper Trustee 08 September 2020
None on record
MARGARET MARY EWEN Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Miroslava Jacqueline Oldham BA BSc Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
MARGARET ANN ABBOTT Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record