LOOE SAVES THE DAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote public appreciation of the art of music in particular by staging live music performances in the town of Looe, Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 May 2019: CIO registration
- LOOE LIVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARMAND JEAN TOMS | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Noel Sheehan | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Barker BA FCCA | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jan Leslie Scattergood | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2022 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2022 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2022 | 653 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2022 | 653 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BY STAGING LIVE MUSIC PERFORMANCES IN THE TOWN OF LOOE, CORNWALL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Goonwartha Road
LOOE
Cornwall
PL13 2PJ
- Phone:
- 01503262929
- Email:
- admin@looesavestheday.co.uk
- Website:
-
looesavestheday.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window