ELAYOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, VULNERABLE AND/OR ISOLATED WOMEN BY THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT DURING PREGNANCY, CHILDBIRTH AND THE POSTNATAL PERIOD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Andrew Hart | Chair | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jenny Sadler | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Louise Wheeler | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Stevens | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Coleman | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Faith Vedder | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £18.00k | £25.65k | £29.98k | £93.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.79k | £14.48k | £28.07k | £31.82k | £39.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF WOMEN IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, VULNERABLE AND/OR ISOLATED WOMEN BY THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT DURING PREGNANCY, CHILDBIRTH AND THE POSTNATAL PERIOD. THE DEFINITION OF “VULNERABLE” WOMEN INCLUDES WOMEN AFFECTED BY PERINATAL MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, SUBSTANCE ABUSE, DOMESTIC ABUSE VICTIMS, REFUGEES/MIGRANTS/ASYLUM SEEKERS, VICTIMS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING, HUMAN SLAVERY AND SEXUAL EXPLOITATION OR ANY OTHER VULNERABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elayos
c/o Southfields Farm
Packington Lane
Coleshill
BIRMINGHAM
- Phone:
- 07738591466
- Email:
- info@elayos.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window