INTERNATIONAL CARDIOMYOPATHY NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of healthcare professionals regarding cardiomyopathy and related conditions Promotion of research into cardiomyopathy and related conditions Establishment of best practice in the treatment and management of cardiomyopathy and related conditions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 18 July 2019: CIO registration
- ICON (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Perry Mark Elliott | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Guiseppe Limongelli | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Jolanda Van Der Velden | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Eloisa Arbustini | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juan Ramon Gimeno Blanes | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aristides Anastasakis | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Ales Linhart | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucie Carrier | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juan Pablo Kaski | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Iacopo Olivotto | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £120.36k | £45.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £41.77k | £104.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONAL ON THE SUBJECT OF CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED DISEASES OF THE HEART MUSCLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND OTHER METHODS THAT TRUSTEES SEE FIT SO AS TO IMPROVE THE DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED DISEASES OF THE HEART MUSCLE THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND FACILITATION OF RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED DISEASES OF THE HEART MUSCLE BY PROVIDING NETWORKING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESEARCHERS, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO RESEARCHERS AND OTHER MEANS TRUSTEES SEE FIT. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS WORLDWIDE THROUGH THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH INTO CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED DISEASES OF THE HEART MUSCLE. (4) TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CARDIOMYOPATHY AND DISEASES OF THE HEART MUSCLE WORLDWIDE THROUGH THE CREATION, MONITORING AND DEVELOPMENT OF RELEVANT GUIDANCE ON THE TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES. (5) TO IMPROVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CARDIOMYOPATHY WORLDWIDE THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH RELEVANT STAKEHOLDERS IN ADVOCATING FOR IMPROVE ACCESS TO TREATMENT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SUCH DISEASES. (6) TO INCREASE AWARENESS OF CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED DISORDERS AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THE SUPPORT AND INFORMATION AVAILABLE TO PEOPLE WITH CARDIOMYOPATHY AND RELATED CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Cardiomyopathy UK
75a Woodside Road
Amersham
Buckinghamshire
- Phone:
- 01494791224
- Email:
- joel@cardiomyopathy-icon.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window