WHITWICK AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objectives of U3A are 1. to advance the education of the public, in particular the education of older people no longer in full time gainful employment in Whitwick and District and its surrounding locality. 2.The provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the above persons in the interests of their social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 December 2018: Standard registration
- WAD U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Louise Charlotte James | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Park | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Susan Daugherty | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Collins | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER EALING JOHNSON | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Katherine Johnson | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Collier | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Fletcher | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Read | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ann Gwinnutt | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.11k | £7.18k | £6.20k | £25.53k | £27.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.19k | £5.89k | £13.68k | £23.81k | £25.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN WHITWICK & DISTRICT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. II. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 GREENHILL ROAD
COALVILLE
LE67 4RH
- Phone:
- 07963826561
- Email:
- chair@whitwicku3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window