FOX ANGELS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of Foxes and other animals in need of care and attention and in particular to provide or maintain refuges or hospitals or other facilities for the collection, reception, care and rehabilitation of sick or ill-treated Foxes and other animals until their eventual release into the wild or otherwise their transfer to a sanctuary or rehomed in the case of domesticated animals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Driscoll | Chair | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracie Jean Williams | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Featherby | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Leslie Hemstock | Trustee | 17 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Watkins | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christian Chapman | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Donelly | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £12.37k | £20.44k | £35.17k | £76.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.55k | £6.00k | £12.42k | £42.94k | £66.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF FOXES IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN REFUGES OR HOSPITALS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, RECEPTION, CARE AND REHABILITATION OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED FOXES UNTIL THEIR EVENTUAL RELEASE INTO THE WILD OR OTHERWISE THEIR TRANSFER TO A SANCTUARY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE BEHAVIOUR AND ECOLOGY OF FOXES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BRAYFORD SQUARE
LONDON
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 01406331000
- Email:
- foxangelsuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window