THE FAITH MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects and aims The object of the charity is to advance the Catholic religion by means of producing, publishing and distributing books, magazines, pamphlets and other literature; by producing electronic and digital media communications and broadcasts; and by organising and hosting conferences, lectures, courses and study events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 February 2020: CIO registration
- 20 May 2024: Funds received from 278314 THE FAITH-KEYWAY TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick John Burke | Chair | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev William Frank Massie | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
ANGELA Hughes | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Matthew O'Gorman | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Michael Charles Frederick Dolman | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Nicky James Welsh | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Richard Paul Marsden | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROSEANN REDDY | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Ross Campbell | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Gregory Farrelly | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Canon Luiz Joao Ruscillo | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Thomas Joseph Parr | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael Parr | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.54k | £14.38k | £7.70k | £99.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.80k | £19.82k | £21.23k | £34.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN SUCH MANNER AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF: A. PRODUCING AND/OR PUBLISHING FOR DISTRIBUTION AND/OR SALE LITERATURE (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, BOOKS, MAGAZINES, JOURNALS AND/OR PAMPHLETS), MUSIC, RECORDINGS (AUDIO, VIDEO AND/OR DIGITAL), DIGITAL AND/OR ELECTRONIC MEDIA PRODUCTIONS AND/OR COMMUNICATIONS, BROADCASTS, PODCASTS AND OTHER SIMILAR MATTER ON AND/OR RELATING TO THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION; AND B. ORGANISING AND/OR HOSTING CONFERENCE, LECTURES, COURSES, DISCUSSION AND/OR STUDY GROUPS AND/OR PRAYER MEETINGS IN EACH CASE ON AND/OR CONCERNING THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Buckingham Way
Wallington
Surrey
SM6 9LT
- Phone:
- 07771993801
- Email:
- admin@faith.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window