EAST SUSSEX VETERANS HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Sussex Veterans Hub 99/100 Group (ESVH) is a volunteer-based organisation offering a unique, comprehensive support package for veterans of HM Forces, particularly those with welfare, mental-ill health and PTSD, ex-offenders and alcohol or substance misuse issues. It is based in Hastings and provides an open office, a drop-in facility and special interest group meetings and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £161,227 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 24 May 2019: CIO registration
- 99/100 GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Stonestreet | Chair | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sleat | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Parks | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Stonestreet | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.70k | £142.12k | £333.40k | £496.57k | £183.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.74k | £99.50k | £274.15k | £424.87k | £221.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.16k | N/A | N/A | £433.15k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | £107.09k | £134.50k | £60.00k | £161.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 08 April 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES COMMUNITY AND CIVILIAN EMERGENCY SERVICES AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF NON-CLINICAL HUMAN RESOURCE SUPPORT; B) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON ISSUES CONCERNING THEM, FOR EXAMPLE, WELLBEING AND COPING STRATEGIES, MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, PRE AND POST CLINICAL THERAPIES, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; C) TO WORK WITH INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS AS APPROPRIATE TO FURTHER THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESVH
5 Harold Place
Hastings
TN34 1JA
- Phone:
- 01424 446292
- Email:
- esvh99100@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window