HELPING HANDS OF LONDON

Charity Number: 1181363
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping Hands of London is a homeless charity aiming to get bags of essentials to everyone sleeping rough within and around London. We also intend to help change attitudes towards homeless people to make them more positive.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 October 2022

Total income: £617
Total expenditure: £1,806

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 December 2018: CIO registration
  • 12 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 12 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1082947 CRISIS UK
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022
Total gross income £2.29k £1.08k £5.05k £617
Total expenditure £1.35k £1.32k £0 £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2022 08 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 08 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 01 October 2021 11 October 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 22 March 2023 233 days late
Annual return 01 October 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 01 October 2019 04 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 09 August 2020 8 days late