ISLAMIC OUTREACH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic Outreach Project (IOP) is a very unique group that focuses on sharing the real and clear message of Islam with the wider community in UK and beyond. The main objective of the IOP is: To advance the Islamic religion throughout the United Kingdom and beyond for the benefit of the public. Contributing towards a better society by promoting better understanding and social cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naveed Ahmed | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mir Aman Ullah | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Qasim Iqbal | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shafiq | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saleem Hussain | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irfan Jehangir | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ayub Pervaz | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Pervaiz Khan | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.83k | £142.60k | £88.90k | £109.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.63k | £37.06k | £104.71k | £48.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, SEMINARS, OUTREACH AND INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM; * CONTRIBUTING TO THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES; * CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS A BETTER SOCIETY BY PROMOTING SOCIAL COHESION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Islamic Outreach Project
PO Box 17801
BIRMINGHAM
B9 9NX
- Phone:
- +447944101859
- Email:
- askme@learnislam4free.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window