Financial history THE ROCHDALE SOCIETY OF MODEL AND EXPERIMENTAL ENGINEERS

Charity Number: 1181083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £9.30k £5.42k £13.64k £6.44k £11.52k
Total expenditure £3.46k £3.67k £6.15k £6.68k £7.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A £5.00k N/A N/A