Trustees THE ROCHDALE SOCIETY OF MODEL AND EXPERIMENTAL ENGINEERS
Charity Number: 1181083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John David Schofield | Chair | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman Royds | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CORNELIUS INGHAM | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Gordon Potts | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Hilton | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Foster | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Larry Quinn | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HAYTER | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY HUME HARTLEY | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.