LUMIAR STOWFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance for the public benefit education in the United Kingdom, in particular by establishing, maintaining carrying on and managing Lumiar Stowford as a school. To promote for the benefit of local inhabitants the provision of facilities for education, recreation or other leisure time .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Brown | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|||||
STUART NICHOLSON | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Ellen Rawlins | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Symonds-Moore | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.48k | £206.74k | £281.43k | £226.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.27k | £215.15k | £276.31k | £234.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
Ò TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON AND MANAGING LUMIAR STOWFORD AS A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AS DAY PUPILS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE LUMIAR METHODOLOGY. Ò TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OF THE INHABITANTS OF WILTSHIRE AND SOMERSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stowford Manor Farm
Wingfield
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 9LH
- Phone:
- 07869949366
- Email:
- admin@lumiar.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window