WILKES EDUCATION SCHOLARSHIP TRUST (WEST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEST is a scholarship awarding charity that provides limited financial support to students from an African Caribbean heritage background. Successful applicants will need to be able to demonstrate the following for example: * High performing students * That they have been accepted onto an approved degree equivalent programme * Provided all the requested information in a timely manner
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EARLE ANTHONY WILKES MA, FIfL | Chair | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melissa May Wilkes BA Hons | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.48k | £20.30k | £6.76k | £0 | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.45k | £12.80k | £9.88k | £3.50k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 26 October 2021 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAR 2019 as amended on 22 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR INDIVIDUALS OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF A SCHOLARSHIP TO SUCH PERSONS ON FULL-TIME HIGHER EDUCATION UNIVERSITY PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Station Road
HAMPTON
Middlesex
TW12 2BX
- Phone:
- 07384682324
- Email:
- info@wilkestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window