STOCKBRIDGE AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOCKBRIDGE VILLAGE AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR AMATEUR BOXING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 2018: CIO registration
- STOCKY ABC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMIE ASPINALl | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BURKE | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY THOMPSON | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.84k | £2.35k | £2.34k | £7.19k | £3.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.38k | £1.77k | £1.48k | £3.75k | £7.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION AND EDUCATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KNOWSLEY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PARTAKE IN BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STOCKBRIDGE AMATEUR BOXING CLUB
THE COMMUNITY PAVILLION
POOL HEY
STOCKBRIDGE VILLAGE
L28 4EP
- Phone:
- 07717317402
- Email:
- aspinall@sky.com
- Website:
-
WWW.STOCKYABC.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window