NEWQUAY CHRISTADELPHIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious services, pastoral and social activities, outreach, support of charitable causes both in and outside the Christadelphian community. Most activities take place in the Newquay area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 04 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh White | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nigel Patterson | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hackett | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Green | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brown | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89k | £13.91k | £8.67k | £8.89k | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.85k | £9.08k | £8.36k | £9.93k | £12.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BIBLE-BASED CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ÆCHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITHÆ, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ECCLESIA AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN AND AROUND NEWQUAY THROUGH ACTIVITIES WHICH INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO: (1) PREACHING TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH PERSONAL ENGAGEMENT AND/OR BY INVITATIONS TO PREACHING/TEACHING MEETINGS AND/OR BY OTHER MEANS. (2) HOLDING MEETINGS FOR THE ECCLESIA, FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE TEACHING AND PASTORAL CARE. (3) ENGAGING WITH THE LOCAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUNDAY SCHOOL AND YOUTH ACTIVITIES. (4) ENGAGING WITH THE WIDER CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND WIDER PUBLIC THROUGH PERIODIC COLLECTIONS AND DONATIONS FOR CHARITABLE NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH
QUARRY PARK ROAD
NEWQUAY
TR7 2NP
- Phone:
- 01637871502
- Email:
- nqycdlphns@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window