Financial history SHAHEEDI BUNGA

Charity number: 1185103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.65k £9.62k £11.69k £12.66k £15.37k
Total expenditure £0 £3.29k £9.12k £17.27k £12.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A