Trustees SHAHEEDI BUNGA
Charity number: 1185103

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baljinder Singh Varaich | Chair | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sukhdev Singh | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Singh Baljinder | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daljinder Singh Gill | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Balinder Singh Samra | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Boota Singh Gill | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jasvir Singh Gill | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.