Third Sector Together North West London

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the health and wellbeing of residents of the London Borough of Hillingdon and the surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,817,200
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.82m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,346,760
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.35m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,648,086 from 10 government contract(s) and £70,067 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.35m |
People

29 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
152 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 22 March 2019: CIO registration
- 3ST NWL (Working name)
- H4ALL C.I.C (Previous name)
- H4ALL CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frederick Walker | Chair | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Janet Wegener | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Louis Daimant | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Breen | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|||||
ROGER CALVERLEY | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.32m | £1.54m | £1.73m | £1.93m | £1.82m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12m | £1.48m | £1.55m | £1.74m | £2.35m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £952.78k | £1.24m | £1.45m | £1.79m | £1.65m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £113.60k | £94.61k | £84.37k | £70.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £3.44k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £234 | £2.60k | £4.66k | £5.19k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.15m | £1.54m | £1.73m | £1.92m | £1.82m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.17m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.12m | £1.48m | £1.55m | £1.74m | £2.35m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.44k | £15.07k | £15.33k | £0 | £21.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.08m | £2.04m | £2.00m | £1.97m | £1.50m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £306.14k | £723.73k | £1.44m | £1.26m | £1.49m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £169.78k | £489.86k | £980.19k | £578.14k | £871.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Mar 2019 as amended on 03 Feb 2023 as amended on 07 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: (A) The advancement of the health and wellbeing, in particular: (I) by the development and delivery of health, wellbeing and other services; and (II) by promoting access to preventative resources provided by other voluntary sector organisations; and (B) The promotion and improvement of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and not-for-profit, voluntary and community organisations in particular but not exclusively by the provision and management of office accommodation, conference, training and other facilities, services or support.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3ST
Key House
106 High Street
Yiewsley
WEST DRAYTON
Middlese
- Phone:
- 01895543434
- Email:
- hillingdon@3STnwl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window