THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT WITH ST MATTHIAS EARL'S COURT

Charity number: 1182543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Cuthbert's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Vicar in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has the responsibilities for the maintenance and upkeep of the buildings and contents of the Church and The Philbeach Halls complex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £223,540
Total expenditure: £224,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kensington And Chelsea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul Andrew Bagott Chair 20 March 2013
INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS' CLUB (CHURCH OF ENGLAND) LTD
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE CHARLOTTE OLIPHANT BOUNTY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY WESTALL FOR POOR
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY OF OUR LADY OF PEW IN WESTMINSTER ABBEY
Received: On time
Robert Andrew Drake Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Dr Brian Edward Parsons Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Bill Troop Trustee 25 January 2015
None on record
Paul David Scutt Trustee 24 April 2014
None on record
Dr Nicholas Jackson Brett Green Trustee 25 April 1994
CHARITY OF THE REVEREND HENRY WESTALL FOR POOR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £291.41k £192.81k £188.95k £172.75k £223.54k
Total expenditure £212.34k £213.67k £160.58k £173.16k £224.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 November 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
50 Philbeach Gardens
Earls Court
London
SW5 9EB
Phone:
02073703263