ENDERUN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1183831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Establish community nurseries and supplementary school. Food aid for vulnerable people. Help people in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £146,556
Total expenditure: £133,541

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 June 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • stoke newington education and cultural centre (Working name)
  • ENDERUN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ramazan bulduk Chair 18 April 2020
None on record
Halil Ibrahim Dalkir Trustee 01 July 2021
THE UNITED KINGDOM TURKISH ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE
Received: On time
Saban eren Trustee 18 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.51k £93.65k £106.53k £138.12k £146.56k
Total expenditure £76.04k £102.26k £99.32k £117.65k £133.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.25k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1A
CLISSOLD ROAD
LONDON
N16 9EX
Phone:
02072415425
Website:

No information available