Financial history CALLINGTON LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1181024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.65k £4.79k £15.32k £33.55k £25.57k
Total expenditure £15.23k £7.42k £13.22k £34.05k £28.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A