Financial history USURP ART

Charity number: 1183720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/06/2020 04/06/2021 04/06/2022 04/06/2023 04/06/2024
Total gross income £12.79k £20.71k £1.53k £4.99k £7.44k
Total expenditure £5.38k £7.38k £879 £756 £553
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £20.20k N/A N/A N/A