NOCN JOB CARDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of operatives working in industry by: - facilitating competence card schemes which will set standards & develop and test competences in order to increase public confidence in the operatives' work; - promoting participation by operatives in all forms of education & training and in the schemes; - improving the quality, flexibility and access of operatives to learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£3,694,428
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.69m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,662,466
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.66m | |
Retained for future use | £31.96k |
People

35 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 15 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Margret Haworth | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Dickinson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Carl Hassell | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Hasting-Evans | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.01m | £3.77m | £3.63m | £3.69m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78m | £2.90m | £3.27m | £3.66m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £124.72k | £13.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £124.72k | £13.24k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.89m | £3.75m | £3.63m | £3.69m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.78m | £2.90m | £3.27m | £3.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £42.31k | £31.77k | £41.10k | £6.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.10m | £2.55m | £2.20m | £2.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £886.69k | £1.43m | £812.29k | £840.64k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.82m | £3.91m | £2.58m | £2.39m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 OCT 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 APR 2023 as amended on 13 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the advancement of education in one or more of the following ways: (1) by promoting and widening participation in education and training including for those people who have previously been excluded from educational opportunities; (2) by improving the quality and flexibility of educational provision for the public benefit, including for those people who have previously been excluded from educational opportunities; (3) by improving access for learning opportunities and facilitating progression to further learning, employment and higher education particularly through the award of credit and credit-based qualifications and assured courses; (4) by facilitating skills and competence card schemes for individuals working in industry within the UK and Eire and in other countries which recognise skills and competency card schemes, which will set standards and develop and test skills and competencies in order to increase public confidence in the individuals' work; (5) by promoting participation by individuals in the schemes; (6) by promoting participation by individuals in all forms of education and training in conjunction with and in addition to the schemes; (7) by improving the quality and flexibility of the educational provision available to individuals; (8) by improving access for individuals to learning opportunities and facilitating progression to further learning, employment and higher education; (9) by delivering continuing professional development, training qualifications and assessment qualifications to individuals; (10) by working with industry to ensure the schemes and the individuals covered by the schemes are ready for advancements in new technologies; and (11) by ensuring the schemes meet the needs of the individuals covered by the schemes.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acero Building
1 Concourse Way
Sheffield
- Phone:
- 0300 999 1177
- Email:
- enquiries@jobcards.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window