SHER-E-RABBANI ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1187149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious (Islamic) activities mainly focused on practical learning of religion and religious education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mian Waleed Ahmad Chair 02 January 2019
None on record
Mian Muhammad Saleh Trustee 10 January 2020
None on record
Umar Javaid Butt Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
Bilal Butt Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
Abrar Ahmed Anwar BSC Hons Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
Waqar Ahmed Malik Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
Muhammad Aslam Saqib Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 October 2024 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 October 2024 158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 06 June 2023 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 06 June 2023 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 August 2022 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 August 2022 93 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Abacus Online Distribution Ltd
915 Yeovil Road
SLOUGH
SL1 4JG
Phone:
07876225580