HEART OF LOVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To empower and transform women's and children's lives in the UK and Africa. Children are given the tools to thrive in a safe, supportive environment through collaboration advocacy, delivering critical services and achieving their fullest potential. We provide: counselling, support in setting goals, family day trips and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Milton Keynes
- Throughout London
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 09 October 2019: CIO registration
- HEART OF LOVE (Working name)
- U CAN DO IT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen Gbayagula | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rogers | Trustee | 15 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £15.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £15.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 September 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 July 2024 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Oct 2019 as amended on 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, AUTISM AND A VARIETY OF OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES IN LONDON AND MILTON KEYNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE CARE SESSIONS AND WORKSHOPS IN MUSIC POETRY, ART AND COMMUNICATION AND SOCIAL TECHNIQUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Downing Close
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 6EP
- Phone:
- 07309756248
- Email:
- Info@ucandoitcyf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window