Urban Green Newcastle

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsible for the management and upkeep of 33 parks and about 60 allotment sites in Newcastle. We ensure free to enter, safe and well maintained parks and allotments for people of all ages, communities and backgrounds to enjoy. We provide activities, events and performances that encourage more people to access and enjoy the city's parks and allotments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,513,527
Donations and legacies | £281.22k | |
Charitable activities | £1.79m | |
Other trading activities | £418.27k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £21.04k |
Total expenditure:
£3,223,837
Raising funds | £430.53k | |
Charitable activities | £2.79m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £977,453 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £430.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.79m |
People

35 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
181 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 19 March 2019: Standard registration
- NEWCASTLE PARKS AND ALLOTMENTS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Beirne | Chair | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Wilton | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Schofield | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ella Ritchie | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gina Tiller | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Aitken | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cresswell | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Val Keen | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73m | £2.74m | £3.30m | £3.61m | £2.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92m | £2.32m | £2.98m | £3.38m | £3.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.01m | £1.71m | £1.78m | £1.23m | £977.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.34k | £100.03k | £371.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £172.45k | £194.73k | £476.34k | £1.18m | £281.22k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £50.83k | £3.62k | £368.54k | £451.38k | £418.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.50m | £2.07m | £2.43m | £1.91m | £1.79m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.18k | £813 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £11.98k | £476.55k | £27.98k | £65.85k | £21.04k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.15m | £2.32m | £2.59m | £2.85m | £2.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £21.10k | £1.05k | £390.51k | £535.38k | £430.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £37.88k | £36.33k | £35.94k | £15.91k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £751.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £69.11k | £104.59k | £427.04k | £421.19k | £307.86k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.32m | £1.79m | £1.67m | £1.90m | £1.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£953.00k | -£1.47m | -£1.14m | £0 | £12.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £701.59k | £740.96k | £562.47k | £513.26k | £657.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 APR 2019 as amended on 05 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS TO: 4.1.1 PROVIDE, MAINTAIN, PROTECT, IMPROVE AND EQUIP PARKS, GARDENS, LANDSCAPED AREAS, WOODLANDS, OPEN SPACES, PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATIONAL AMENITY SPACES (THE PARKS); 4.12 ADVANCE HEALTH BY PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY OUTDOOR RECREATION AND AMATEUR SPORT; 4.1.3 PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ALLOTMENT FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS; AND 4.1.4 ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE OBJECTS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR IN: (A) THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING THE FLORA AND FAUNA, WILDLIFE, BIODIVERSITY AND NATURAL HABITATS OF THE PARKS; (B) THE HISTORY, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND TRADITIONS OF THE NORTH EAST; AND (C) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE PARKS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ouseburn Parks Visitor Centre
Red Walk
Jesmond Dene
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE7 7BQ
- Phone:
- 01918144574
- Email:
- info@urbangreennewcastle.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window